Governing Body Members 24-25
NAME |
TYPE |
RESPONSIBILITY |
---|---|---|
Daniel Momah |
Chair Appointed by LGB |
Chair of Governers |
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2024 |
Nil |
|
Robert Bradley |
Headteacher Appointed by TKAT |
Headteacher at Gray's Farm Primary Academy |
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2024 |
Nil | |
Kate Osborne |
Headteacher Appointed by TKAT |
Headteacher at Gray’s Farm Primary Academy |
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2024 |
Nil | |
Caroline Leroi |
Vice Chair Appointed by LGB |
Link Governor for Safeguarding |
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2024 |
TBC |
|
Claire Appleton |
Staff Elected by staff |
|
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2024 | Nil | |
Sarah Madden |
Appointed Appointed by LGB |
|
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2024 | Nil | |
Carol Thomas |
|
Clerk to Governors |
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2024 |
Clerk to Governors at other TKAT academies. |
Leavers 23-24
NAME |
TYPE |
RESPONSIBILITY |
---|---|---|
Dami Oyebade Chair from September 2020 to September 2022 Resignation date: 4th April 2024 |
Appointed | |
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2023 | None | |
Victoria Smith Resignation date: 22nd July 2024 |
Appointed | Link governor for Teaching and Learning |
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2023 | None | |
Fatma Faydali Resignation date: 22nd July 2024 |
Parent | |
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2023 | None | |
Soley Esat Resignation date: 22nd July 2024 |
Parent | |
Declarations of Interest to 31st August 2023 | None |